U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 29, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.