U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gunderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Suppress ]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.