U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espinoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Suppress ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • October 21, 2021: [Letter - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 19, 2021: [Remark - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.