U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Letter - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 20, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.