U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:04-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • February 08, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.