U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Conroy v. State Farm Insurance Companies et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 12, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • August 12, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 28, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 28, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 22, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.