U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Dismiss ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.