U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stella
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Satisfaction of Judgment - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report (Addendum) - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • July 05, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Waiver - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 13, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 05, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • June 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.