U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Matta v. Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 22, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
  • June 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.