U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Carter v. McKinnon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 23, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.