U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Chiefstick v. Salmonson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 12, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.