U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Reinert v. Gootkin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.