U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:10-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cobell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 24, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.