U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standingrock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 30, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Docket Entry AND Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order for Warrant ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 25, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.