U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Cloninger et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 26, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 20, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2021: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • September 03, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 28, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 16, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 25, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 25, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.