U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:17-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stubbins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
  • July 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.