U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05105-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Burt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 17, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 01, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.