U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Speck v. Saul
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Social Security Opening Brief]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.