U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00077
  • Case Name: McDonald v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • February 03, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • January 17, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Administrative Record]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 01, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.