U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:17-cr-00009-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Abundiz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.