U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Hammons v. Saul
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 05, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Social Security Opening Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.