U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Anderson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Mail Returned]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.