U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alatorre et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.