U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Weimer v. MSFT Washington Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 24, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 14, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2022: [Appear]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Clarify - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Joinder in Motion - MT]
  • November 11, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 11, 2021: [Vacate]
  • November 11, 2021: [Stay Discovery - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 19, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 05, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 01, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Disqualify Judge]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.