U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Filing 2255 - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [2255 (Motion to Vacate) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.