U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Morris et al v. First Interstate Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Staff Notes - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Withdraw]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 08, 2021: [Stay]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Remand]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.