U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Serino v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • October 03, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Remark]
  • September 19, 2022: [Affidavit in Support]
  • September 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Errata - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 07, 2022: [Affidavit in Support]
  • September 06, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [In Limine]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 29, 2022: [In Limine]
  • July 27, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 24, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 04, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Extending Scheduling Order Deadlines - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 07, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.