U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hampton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2021: [Letter - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.