U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Remillard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.