U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Decarlo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 13, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.