U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 08, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.