U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fillion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.