U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bolte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.