U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • June 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Conference ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Exparte Motion - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Exparte Motion - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.