U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Tenke v. The Estate of Melanie Decrane, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Statement - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.