U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:16-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Belanus v. Knudsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Supplement - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 24, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.