U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Card et al v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 11, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 27, 2021: [Vacate]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 09, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.