U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Latray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 19, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • July 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.