U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Friends of Animals v. Zinke et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.