U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00077
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Nemetz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 23, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 09, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.