U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Preuit v. C.R. Bard Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 20, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 09, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.