U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:15-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weniger et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.