U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Yellowstone Rental Properties, LLC v. United Financial Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Default Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Default]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Vacate]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.