U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-po-05019-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Trial - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Quash ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
  • July 12, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.