U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rhinehart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 17, 2022: [Dismiss ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 21, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.