U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wood
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • July 15, 2021: [Summons]
  • July 15, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.