U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morsette et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Dismissal - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Dismiss ]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 14, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2021: [Vacate]
  • November 18, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Telephone Conference ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.