U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Volk v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Appear]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 19, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 19, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.