U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90133-
  • Case Name: KRISTY ANN EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • October 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.