U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tome
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.